There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Peanut Program Modernization Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the existing quota and price support program for peanuts and to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to support the price of peanuts at a level to be determined by the Secretary.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/17/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/21/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Tobacco and Peanuts.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/17/1990Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 05/17/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/24/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/24/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/24/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/24/1990
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 05/24/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/24/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/24/1990
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 05/24/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 05/24/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/24/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/24/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/24/1990
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/24/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/24/1990
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/24/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/24/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/24/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/24/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 05/24/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/24/1990
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/24/1990
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 05/24/1990
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 05/24/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/24/1990
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 05/24/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 05/24/1990
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 05/24/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/24/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 05/24/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/24/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/24/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/1990
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 05/24/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/24/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/24/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/24/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/24/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/24/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/24/1990
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 05/24/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/24/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 05/24/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/24/1990
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/14/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/14/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/14/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/14/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/18/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 07/18/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/18/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/17/1990 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Tobacco and Peanuts05/21/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4845.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4845. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/17/1990)

Peanut Program Modernization Act of 1990 - Amends the Agricultural Adjustment Act of 1938 to repeal peanut marketing quota provisions.

Amends the Agricultural Act of 1949 to replace existing peanut price support provisions with price supports as determined by the Secretary of Agriculture based upon specified factors, including production costs and domestic and foreign demand.