Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/20/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/20/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/20/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/20/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/20/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/20/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 06/20/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/20/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/20/1990
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/20/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/20/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/20/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/20/1990
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/20/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/20/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/20/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/20/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/12/1990
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/12/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/12/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/12/1990
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/12/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/12/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/12/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 07/27/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/25/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/25/1990