Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/07/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 06/07/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 06/07/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 06/07/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/07/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 06/11/1990
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/11/1990
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/11/1990
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/11/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/11/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/12/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/12/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/12/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/12/1990
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 06/12/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/12/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/12/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/12/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/12/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/13/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/13/1990
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/13/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/13/1990
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 06/13/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 06/13/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/13/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/13/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 06/13/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/14/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/14/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 06/14/1990
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/14/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/14/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 06/14/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/14/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/14/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/14/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 06/14/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/18/1990
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 06/18/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 06/18/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/18/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/18/1990
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/18/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/18/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/18/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/20/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/20/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/20/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/20/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/20/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/20/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/20/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/20/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/20/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/21/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/21/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/21/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/21/1990
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 06/21/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/25/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/25/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/25/1990
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/25/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/25/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 06/25/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/25/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/25/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/10/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/10/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/10/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/27/1990