Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-8]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 06/12/1990
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/21/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/21/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 06/21/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/21/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/21/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/21/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/21/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/21/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/21/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/21/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/21/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/27/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/27/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/27/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/27/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 06/27/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 06/28/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 06/28/1990
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/12/1990
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 07/13/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 07/13/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 07/13/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/13/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/13/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/13/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 07/13/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/13/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 07/13/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 07/13/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 07/13/1990
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/13/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/13/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/13/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/13/1990
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 07/13/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/17/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/17/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 07/17/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/17/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/17/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 07/17/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 07/17/1990
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 07/17/1990
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/17/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 07/17/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/17/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 07/17/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/17/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/17/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 07/17/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/17/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 07/17/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/19/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/19/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/19/1990
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/19/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/19/1990
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 07/19/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/19/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/19/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/19/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/23/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/23/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 07/23/1990
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 07/23/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/24/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/24/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/24/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/24/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 07/26/1990
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 07/26/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/26/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 07/26/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/26/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 07/26/1990
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 07/26/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/26/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 07/26/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/26/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 07/26/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/26/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 07/26/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/26/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/26/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/26/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/26/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/26/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/26/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/26/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/26/1990
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/26/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/26/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 07/26/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/26/1990
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 07/26/1990
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 07/26/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 07/26/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/26/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 07/26/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/26/1990
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/26/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/26/1990
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/26/1990
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 07/26/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 07/26/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 07/26/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 07/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 07/26/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 07/26/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 07/26/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/26/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 08/01/1990
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 08/01/1990
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 08/01/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/01/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 08/01/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/01/1990
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 08/01/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 08/01/1990
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 08/01/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/1990
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/01/1990
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 08/01/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 08/01/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 08/01/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 08/01/1990
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 08/01/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 08/01/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 08/01/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 08/01/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 08/01/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 08/01/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/01/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 08/01/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/01/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 08/01/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 08/01/1990
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 08/01/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 08/01/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 08/01/1990
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/01/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 08/01/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/02/1990
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/03/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/10/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/12/1990
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 09/12/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/12/1990
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 09/12/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 09/12/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 09/18/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 09/18/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/18/1990
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 09/19/1990
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 09/25/1990
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/25/1990