There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to make Federal elections more competitive, open, and honest by providing for a House of Representatives election limitation on contributions from persons other than local individual residents.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/13/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/20/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Elections.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
06/13/1990Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/13/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 06/13/1990
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 06/13/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 06/13/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/13/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 06/13/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/10/1990
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/10/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 07/10/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 07/10/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 07/10/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 07/27/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 08/02/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 08/02/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 08/02/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 08/02/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 08/02/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 08/02/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 08/02/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 08/02/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/13/1990 Referred to
House Administration Subcommittee on Elections06/20/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5032.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5032. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/13/1990)

Amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to prohibit candidates for the House of Representatives from accepting contributions from persons other than local individual residents totaling in excess of the total contributions accepted from local individual residents.