Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 06/19/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/19/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/19/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 06/19/1990
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 06/19/1990
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/19/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 06/19/1990
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/19/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/19/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/19/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/19/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 06/19/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 06/19/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 06/19/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/19/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/19/1990
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/19/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/19/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/19/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 06/19/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/19/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 06/21/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/21/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 06/21/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/21/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/21/1990
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/21/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/21/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/21/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/21/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/21/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/21/1990
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/21/1990
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 06/21/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/21/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/21/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/21/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/26/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/26/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/26/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/26/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/26/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/26/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/26/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/26/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/26/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 06/26/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/26/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/26/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/26/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/1990
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/26/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/26/1990
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/26/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/26/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/26/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 06/26/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/26/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 06/26/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 06/26/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/26/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/26/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/26/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/26/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 06/28/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/28/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 06/28/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/28/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 06/28/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/28/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/28/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 06/28/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/28/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 06/28/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 06/28/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 06/28/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/28/1990
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 06/28/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 06/28/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/28/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 06/28/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/28/1990
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/28/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/28/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/28/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/28/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/28/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/28/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 06/28/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/28/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/28/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/28/1990
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/28/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/28/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/28/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/28/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/11/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/11/1990
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 07/11/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/11/1990
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/11/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/11/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/11/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/11/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/11/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/11/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/11/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/11/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/11/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 07/11/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/17/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 07/17/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 07/17/1990
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/17/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/17/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/17/1990
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/25/1990
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 07/25/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/25/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/25/1990
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/25/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/25/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/25/1990
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/25/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/25/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/25/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/25/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/25/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 07/25/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 07/25/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/25/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/25/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/25/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/26/1990
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 07/26/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 07/26/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/27/1990
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 09/10/1990