Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 06/14/1990
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2]* 06/14/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 06/14/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 06/14/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/14/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 06/14/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/19/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/19/1990
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/19/1990
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/21/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/26/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/26/1990
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/26/1990
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 06/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/26/1990
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/26/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 06/26/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/28/1990