Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 07/10/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/03/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 08/03/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 08/03/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 08/03/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 08/03/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 08/03/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 08/03/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/03/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 08/03/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 08/03/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/03/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/03/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 08/03/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/03/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 08/03/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 08/03/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 08/03/1990
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/03/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/03/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 08/03/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 08/03/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/03/1990
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/03/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/03/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/03/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/03/1990
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 08/03/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 08/03/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/03/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 08/03/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/03/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 08/03/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/03/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/03/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 08/03/1990
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 08/03/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/03/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 08/03/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/03/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 08/03/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/03/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/03/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 08/03/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/17/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/17/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/17/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/17/1990
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 09/17/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 09/17/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/17/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/17/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/17/1990
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/17/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/17/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/17/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/17/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 09/17/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/17/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/19/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/19/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/19/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 09/19/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/19/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/19/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/24/1990
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 09/24/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/24/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/24/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/24/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/24/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/24/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/24/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/24/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/24/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 09/24/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/24/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/30/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 09/30/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 10/12/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 10/12/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/12/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/12/1990