Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/13/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 07/13/1990
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 07/13/1990
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/16/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/16/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 07/16/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/16/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 07/16/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/16/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/16/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 07/16/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/16/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/16/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/18/1990
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/18/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/18/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 07/18/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/18/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 07/18/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/18/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/18/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/18/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/18/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/18/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 07/18/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/18/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 07/18/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/18/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 07/18/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/18/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/18/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/18/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/18/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/18/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/19/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/19/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 07/19/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/19/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/19/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/19/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/19/1990
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 07/19/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/19/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/24/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/24/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/24/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 07/24/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/24/1990
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 07/24/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/24/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/25/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/25/1990
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/25/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/25/1990
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 07/25/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/30/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/30/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/30/1990
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/30/1990
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/30/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/30/1990
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/30/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/13/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/13/1990