Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/16/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/18/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 07/18/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/18/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/18/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/19/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/30/1990