Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/16/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/18/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/24/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/25/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/25/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/30/1990