Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 07/13/1990
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 07/13/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/18/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 07/18/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/18/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 07/18/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/18/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 07/18/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/18/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/19/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/19/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/24/1990
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 07/24/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/24/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/24/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/25/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/25/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/13/1990