Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 07/16/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 07/16/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/18/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/18/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 07/18/1990
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/18/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/25/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 07/25/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/25/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 07/31/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/31/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/31/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/12/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 09/12/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/12/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 09/12/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 09/12/1990