There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Transportation Trust Funds Off Budget Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide off-budget treatment for the Highway Trust Fund and the Airport and Airway Trust Fund, if such treatment is provided for the Social Security Trust Fund.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/24/1990Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 101-934, Part I.
07/19/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
10/24/1990Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 101-934, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
08/01/1990Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
08/01/1990Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
07/19/1990Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/1990Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/1990Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 07/19/1990
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/19/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 07/19/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 07/31/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 07/31/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/31/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/31/1990
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/31/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 07/31/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 07/31/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/31/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/31/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/31/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/31/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/31/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/31/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/31/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/31/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 07/31/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/31/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/31/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 07/31/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/31/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/31/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/31/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 07/31/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/31/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/31/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/31/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/31/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 07/31/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/31/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/31/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/31/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 07/31/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 07/31/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/31/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/12/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 09/12/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/12/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/12/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/12/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 09/12/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/12/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 09/12/1990
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/12/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/12/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 09/21/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 10/15/1990

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation07/19/1990 Referred to
08/01/1990 Markup by
10/24/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-934 Part 1
House Government Operations07/19/1990 Referred to
House Rules07/19/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5315.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5315. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (10/24/1990)

Transportation Trust Funds Off Budget Act of 1990 - Prohibits the receipts and disbursements of the Highway Trust Fund (for both the Federal Aid Highway program and the Mass Transit Account) and the Airport and Airway Trust Fund which are allocable to the transportation-related operations of such Funds from being included in either the Federal budget as submitted by the President, or in the congressional budget.

Exempts such Trust funds from any general statutory budget limitation.

Amends the Airport and Airway Improvement Act of 1982 to require the Secretary of Transportation (the Secretary) to estimate: (1) the amount of unfunded aviation authorizations at the close of the next fiscal year; and (2) the net aviation receipts for the 24-month period beginning at the close of such fiscal year. Prescribes adjustment procedures for certain unfunded aviation authorizations, and for aviation apportionments. Requires the Secretary to report such estimates to specified congressional committees.

Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) to exempt specified Airport and Airway Trust Fund and Highway Trust Fund activities from any sequestration order issued under a certain section of the Act.

Amends the Congressional Budget and Impoundment Control Act of 1974 to: (1) exclude receipts and disbursements allocable to transportation-related operations of the Funds in calculating the Federal budget deficit; and (2) prohibit the Congress from considering specified changes to such Funds.