There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the National Academy of Sciences to conduct a study of the feasibility of an umbrella research arm to support research on a variety of environmental issues.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/20/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/24/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research, and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
07/20/1990Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 07/20/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 08/01/1990
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 08/01/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 08/01/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 08/01/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 08/01/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 08/01/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/01/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/01/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/01/1990
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/01/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 08/01/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/02/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/02/1990
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 08/02/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 08/02/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/02/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 08/02/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 08/02/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 08/02/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/02/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/02/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 08/02/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/02/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/02/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 08/02/1990
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/02/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/02/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 08/02/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 08/02/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 08/02/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/02/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 08/03/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 08/03/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 08/03/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 08/03/1990
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 08/03/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 08/03/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 08/03/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/13/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 09/13/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 09/13/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/13/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/13/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space and Technology07/20/1990 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research and Environment07/24/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5341.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5341. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/20/1990)

Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to enter into an agreement with the National Academy of Sciences (NAS) for a study and report to the Congress on: (1) mechanisms for supporting training in the environmental sciences and environmental research through an umbrella research arm, the National Institutes of the Environment, considering research in a wide variety of disciplines; (2) the current state of extramural research support and undergraduate and graduate training relevant to tropical deforestation, species extinction, ecosystem degradation, biological restoration, use of underutilized resources and sustainable resource use, economic consequences of environmental change, and the impacts of humans and the environment on one another; and (3) mechanisms that can be used to advance environmental research and training, their relationship to existing research programs, and appropriate levels and resources of funding.

Authorizes appropriations.