There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/24/1990)

Nonconventional Fuels Credit Extension and Modification Act of 1990 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend the credit for producing fuel from a nonconventional source to wells or facilities in service before January 1, 1993 (currently, January 1, 1991) and sold before January 1, 2001. Redefines gas produced from a tight formation to include only gas: (1) which is committed or dedicated on April 20, 1977, to interstate commerce; or (2) which is produced from a well drilled after the date of enactment of this Act.