Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 07/24/1990
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 07/24/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/31/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 07/31/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/31/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/31/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/31/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/03/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/03/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 08/03/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/03/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 08/03/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/03/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 08/03/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 08/03/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/14/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 09/14/1990
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 09/14/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/21/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/27/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/27/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/12/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/18/1990