Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 07/25/1990
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 08/03/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 08/03/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/11/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/11/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 09/18/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 09/18/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 09/25/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 09/25/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/02/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/11/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/24/1990