There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Commemorative Events Advisory Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a commission to advise the President on proposals for national commemorative events.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/19/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/06/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population
02/22/1989Executive Comment Requested from OMB and OPM.
02/13/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
01/19/1989Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/19/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (118)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 01/19/1989
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 01/19/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/19/1989
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 04/05/1989
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 04/05/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/05/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/05/1989
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 04/05/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/05/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/05/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/05/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 04/05/1989
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 04/05/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/05/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 04/05/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/05/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/05/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/17/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/17/1989
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/17/1989
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/17/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/17/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/17/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/17/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/17/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 05/17/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/07/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/07/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/07/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/07/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/07/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/07/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/07/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 06/07/1989
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/07/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 06/07/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/27/1989
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/27/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/18/1989
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 07/18/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/18/1989
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/18/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 07/18/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/18/1989
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 09/06/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/1989
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 09/06/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 09/06/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/06/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/06/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 11/16/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 11/16/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/16/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 11/16/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 11/16/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 11/16/1989
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/16/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 01/23/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 01/23/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 01/23/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 01/23/1990
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 01/23/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 01/23/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 01/23/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 01/23/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 01/23/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 01/23/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/21/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/21/1990
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/21/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/22/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/1990
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/23/1990
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/23/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 06/26/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/26/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 06/26/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service01/19/1989 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population02/13/1989 Referred to
02/06/1990 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.539. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/19/1989)

National Commemorative Events Advisory Act - Establishes the President's Advisory Commission on National Commemorative Events to: (1) establish criteria for recommending to the President that a proposed commemorative event be approved or disapproved; (2) review proposals for national commemorative events submitted in accordance with procedures published by the Commission; and (3) issue recommendations to the President concerning each proposal reviewed.