There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To nullify the pay raises provided by the Ethics Reform Act of 1989 for Members of Congress, the Judiciary and senior government officials, and to provide that the current method for making annual adjustments in rates of pay for those officials remain in effect.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/31/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
08/27/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/31/1990Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1990Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1990Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1990Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 07/31/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 09/13/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 09/13/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 09/13/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 09/13/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/13/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/18/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 09/18/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/24/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/24/1990
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 09/24/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/26/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/26/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/26/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 09/27/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 09/27/1990
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/01/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/04/1990
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/11/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 10/11/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 10/15/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/15/1990
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/16/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 10/17/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/17/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 10/17/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 10/19/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 10/19/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/22/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 10/24/1990
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 10/26/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 10/27/1990

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service07/31/1990 Referred to
House Judiciary07/31/1990 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice08/27/1990 Referred to
House Administration07/31/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/31/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5416.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5416. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/31/1990)

Provides that the rate of pay of Members of Congress, judicial officers, and Executive Schedule positions shall be that in effect as of November 1, 1989.

Repeals provisions of the Ethics Reform Act of 1989 which provided for a 25 percent salary increase beginning in 1991 for legislative, judicial, and Executive Schedule positions.

States that nothing in this Act shall have the effect of reducing the pay of any individual whose compensation may not, under certain provisions of the U.S. Constitution, be diminished during such individual's continuance in office.

Continues the current adjustment method.