Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 01/19/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 03/15/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/15/1989
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 03/15/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/15/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/15/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/15/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/15/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/15/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/15/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/15/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/15/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/15/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/15/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/15/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/15/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/15/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/15/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/15/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 03/15/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/15/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/15/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 03/15/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 03/15/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/15/1989
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 03/15/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 03/15/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/15/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/15/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 04/13/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/13/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/11/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/11/1989
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/11/1989
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/11/1989
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/11/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 05/25/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/25/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/25/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/25/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/17/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/17/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/02/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/22/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/22/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/22/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 02/22/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/22/1990
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 02/22/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/22/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 02/22/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 02/22/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 02/22/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/22/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 02/22/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/22/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 02/22/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/22/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/22/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/22/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 02/27/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/27/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/19/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/19/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/19/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 04/19/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/19/1990