There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XXV of the Public Health Services Act to make an adjustment relating to minimum allotments under the program of formula grants established in such title.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/02/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/31/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
08/02/1990Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 08/02/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 08/02/1990
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/10/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 09/10/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 09/10/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 09/10/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/10/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 09/10/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 09/10/1990
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/10/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 09/10/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/10/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/10/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 09/10/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/10/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/10/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/10/1990
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 09/10/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/10/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 09/10/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/10/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 09/10/1990
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 09/10/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/10/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/10/1990
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/10/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/17/1990
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/17/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 09/17/1990
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/17/1990
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/17/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 09/17/1990
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/17/1990
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/17/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/17/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/17/1990
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/17/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/26/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 09/26/1990
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 09/26/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/26/1990
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 10/04/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/04/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 10/04/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 10/04/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/11/1990
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 10/11/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/13/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce08/02/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment08/31/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5443.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5443. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/02/1990)

Amends the Public Health Service Act to modify the formula for determining the minimum amount of allotments to States for acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS) public information activities to allow the amount to be equal to the amount received by the State from the Secretary of Health and Human Services, through the Director of the Centers for Disease Control, for FY 1989 for such activities, if those receipts are greater than the amounts under the alternatives specified by existing law.