Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/11/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 09/11/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 09/11/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/11/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/11/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/11/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 09/11/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/11/1990
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/11/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/11/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/19/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 09/19/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 09/19/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/19/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 10/04/1990
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 10/04/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/04/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 10/04/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 10/04/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/18/1990
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/18/1990