Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 08/03/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/03/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/03/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 09/14/1990
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/14/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/14/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/14/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/14/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/14/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/14/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 09/14/1990
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/14/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/14/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 09/14/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/14/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/14/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/14/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/14/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 09/14/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/14/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/14/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 09/14/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/14/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/14/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/25/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/25/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 09/25/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 09/25/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/25/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 09/25/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/25/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/25/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/25/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/25/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/25/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/27/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/27/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 09/27/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 09/27/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/27/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/27/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 09/27/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/27/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/27/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/28/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/28/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/30/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 09/30/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/30/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/02/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/02/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/06/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 10/06/1990
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/06/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/15/1990
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 10/23/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/23/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/24/1990