There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend part C of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 to include the pay of Members of Congress and high-level officers of the executive branch within the coverage of the Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/11/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/14/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
09/11/1990Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/1990Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 09/11/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 09/11/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/19/1990
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/19/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/19/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/19/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 09/19/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/19/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/19/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/19/1990
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 09/19/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 09/19/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/19/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 09/19/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/19/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 09/19/1990
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 09/19/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/19/1990
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/19/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 09/19/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/19/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/19/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 09/19/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 09/19/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/19/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/19/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/19/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/19/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/19/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/19/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/28/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/28/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/28/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/28/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/28/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 09/28/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 09/28/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/28/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 09/28/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/28/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/28/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 09/28/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/28/1990
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 09/28/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 09/28/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 10/02/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/05/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/05/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 10/10/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 10/12/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 10/18/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Operations09/11/1990 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security09/14/1990 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service09/11/1990 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5585. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/11/1990)

Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) to subject the pay of the Vice President, Members of Congress, the Director of the Office of Management and Budget, and heads of cabinet departments of the executive branch to sequestration.

Expresses the sense of Congress that the President forgo pay equal to the percentage reduction in effect under an order relating to the budget account for the Office of the President.