There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Judicial Review Amendments of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make technical amendments to the Veterans' Judicial Review Act.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/15/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/13/1990Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-859. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
09/18/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/18/1990SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
10/15/1990-1:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/15/1990-1:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/15/1990-1:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/15/1990HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
10/15/1990-1:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/15/1990-1:01pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/13/1990HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 530.
10/13/1990HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-859. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
10/13/1990HouseMr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Veterans' Affairs have until midnight on Oct. 13 to file a report on H.R. 5657. Agreed to without objection.
10/12/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/12/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported.
09/18/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/18/1990HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/18/1990 Referred to
10/12/1990 Markup by
10/13/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-859
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/18/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5657.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5657. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/18/1990)

Veterans' Judicial Review Amendments of 1990 - Repeals certain provisions relating to decisions made by the Court of Veterans Appeals in veterans' benefits determinations.

Authorizes the Chief Judge of the Court to annually summon the judges of such Court to a judicial conference in order to consider business of the Court and to improve the administration of justice within the Court's jurisdiction.

Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to release veterans' medical records to the U.S. Court of Veterans Appeals and any other Federal court for use in connection with veterans' appeals under the jurisdiction of such courts.