Summary: H.R.5712 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.5712. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/25/1990)

Applies the Tax Reform Act of 1986 to extend from January 1, 1991, to January 1, 1995, the period during which certain urban renovation projects must be placed in service to qualify for depreciation transition relief.

Sets forth qualifications for such property regarding Federal approval and funding.

Extends from December 31, 1990, until December 31, 1994, the period for issuing tax-exempt bonds for certain redevelopment projects or certain parking facilities.