There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the temporary continuance of essential government services for Americans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/26/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/01/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
09/26/1990Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 09/26/1990
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 09/26/1990
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/26/1990
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 09/26/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 09/26/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/27/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/27/1990
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 09/27/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/27/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 09/27/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/27/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/27/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 09/27/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 09/27/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 09/27/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/27/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/27/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/27/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 09/27/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 09/27/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 09/27/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/27/1990
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/28/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 09/28/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/28/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/28/1990
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/28/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 09/28/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 09/28/1990
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/28/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 09/28/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 10/02/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Operations09/26/1990 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security10/01/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5722.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5722. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/26/1990)

Authorizes the President, in order to protect health and safety of human life, to decrease the sequester amounts specified in the order issued August 25, 1990, under the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act). Requires an increase in the sequester amount in other accounts, programs, projects, or activities to the extent amounts were decreased in such order.