There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center located at 113 Holland Avenue in Albany, New York, as the "Samuel S. Stratton Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/15/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/13/1990Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-860. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
09/27/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date
10/15/1990-12:54pmLaid on the table. See S. 3127 for further action.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/1990-12:53pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/1990-12:53pmOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/1990-12:42pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/1990The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/1990-12:42pmConsidered under suspension of the rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/15/1990-12:41pmMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/13/1990Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 531.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/13/1990Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-860. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
10/13/1990Mr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Veterans' Affairs have until midnight on Oct. 13 to file a report on H.R. 5739. Agreed to without objection.
10/12/1990Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/12/1990Ordered to be Reported.
10/02/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/02/1990Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
10/02/1990Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
09/27/1990Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/02/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/02/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/02/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/02/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/02/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/02/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/02/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/02/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/02/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 10/02/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 10/02/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/02/1990
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/02/1990
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 10/02/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 10/02/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 10/02/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/02/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 10/02/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 10/02/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 10/02/1990
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 10/02/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 10/02/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/02/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 10/02/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 10/02/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 10/02/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/02/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/02/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/02/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 10/02/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/02/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/02/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/02/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/13/1990
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/13/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 10/13/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 10/13/1990
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/13/1990
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 10/13/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/13/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/13/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/13/1990
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/13/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/13/1990
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 10/13/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/13/1990
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/13/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 10/13/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/13/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 10/13/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 10/13/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 10/13/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/13/1990
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/13/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 10/13/1990
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 10/13/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/13/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 10/13/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 10/13/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/13/1990
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 10/13/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/13/1990
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 10/13/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/13/1990
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 10/13/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/27/1990 Referred to
10/12/1990 Markup by
10/13/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-860
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care10/02/1990 Referred to
10/02/1990 Markup by
10/02/1990 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5739.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5739. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/1990)

Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center located at 113 Holland Avenue in Albany, New York, as the Samuel S. Stratton Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center.