There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Technical and Miscellaneous Revenue Act of 1990

Short Titles as Introduced

Technical and Miscellaneous Revenue Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make technical corrections in certain recent tax and trade legislation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/17/1990Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 101-894.
10/12/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
11/05/1990See H.R.5835.
10/17/1990Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 552.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/17/1990Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 101-894.
10/17/1990Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/17/1990Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
10/12/1990Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means10/12/1990 Referred to
10/17/1990 Markup by
10/17/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-894

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5822. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (10/17/1990)

Technical and Miscellaneous Revenue Act of 1990 - Title I: Tax Technical Corrections - Amends the Revenue Reconciliation Act of 1989, the Technical and Miscellaneous Revenue Act of 1988, and the Internal Revenue Code to make technical corrections to various provisions.

Title II: Repeal of Expired or Obsolete Provisions - Subtitle A: Repeal of Expired or Obsolete Provisions - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide for the repeal or modification of expired or obsolete provisions.

Subtitle B: Provisions Relating to Studies - Extends the date for filing reports on certain studies and repeals requirements for certain other studies.

Modifies the study of Americans working abroad under the Foreign Earned Income Act of 1978 to require the Secretary of the Treasury to report as soon as practicable after December 31, 1993, and as soon as practicable after the close of each fifth calendar year thereafter (currently, every fourth calendar year).

Increases from $200,000 to $1,000,000 the tax refund amount which must be reported to the Joint Committee on Taxation.

Title III: Customs and Tariff Provisions - Amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to make specified redesignations to the Schedule's subheadings.

Provides for duty treatment of gloves, mittens, and mitts principally designed for use in sports.

Changes wheel size specifications with respect to 26-inch bicycles.

Grants duty-free treatment, through December 31, 1992, of certain fiberglass tire cord fabric.

Sets forth technical amendments.

Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to reduce the fees for certain customs services and provide an adjustment to such fees for formally-entered merchandise.