There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hunger Emergency Assistance and Relief Trust Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow individuals to direct that part or all of their income tax refunds be contributed to a trust fund established for the relief of domestic and international hunger, and to establish a commission to oversee the distribution of such contributions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/21/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/21/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
01/03/1989Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/1989Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 02/27/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/27/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 02/27/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/27/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/27/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/27/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 02/27/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/27/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/27/1989
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 02/27/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/27/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/27/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/27/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 02/27/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 02/27/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/27/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/27/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 02/27/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/27/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/27/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/27/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/27/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/27/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/27/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 02/27/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/27/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/27/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/27/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/27/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 02/27/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/27/1989
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 02/27/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/27/1989
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 02/27/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 02/27/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/27/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/27/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 02/27/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/13/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 03/13/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/13/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/13/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/13/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 03/13/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/13/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/13/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/13/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/21/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/21/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/21/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/21/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/21/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/21/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/21/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/05/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/05/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/05/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/18/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/18/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/18/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/18/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/18/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 04/18/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/01/1989
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/25/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/25/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/25/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/25/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/07/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/07/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 06/15/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/20/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/27/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/27/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/24/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/24/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/19/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/13/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/30/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/30/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/03/1989 Referred to
House Education and Labor01/03/1989 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education02/21/1989 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources02/21/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.81. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/1989)

Hunger Emergency Assistance and Relief Trust Act of 1989 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow individuals to designate on their income tax returns a contribution of all or part of their tax refunds to the Hunger Emergency Assistance and Relief Trust.

Establishes in the Treasury the Hunger Emergency Assistance and Relief Trust (trust fund) to distribute hunger relief funds to qualified nonprofit hunger relief services organizations. Appropriates to the trust fund amounts equal to those designated on tax returns.

Describes standards and procedures for the distribution of trust fund monies. Specifies a number of restrictions with respect to the activities of recipient organizations, including limitations on administrative expenses.

Requires the Hunger Commission to submit to specified congressional committees an annual report detailing trust fund expenditures.

Establishes a Hunger Commission to administer the distribution of funds to qualified hunger relief services organizations on a matching grant basis. Permits a maximum award of $100,000 to any single qualified organization in any fiscal year. Requires that: (1) at least 50 percent of amounts received into the trust fund in any year be paid to qualified organizations; and (2) monies in the trust fund be distributed within 180 days of their receipt there.

Authorizes appropriations.