There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Wildfire Suppression Assistance Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Wildfire Suppression Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make permanent the authority provided under the Temporary Emergency Wildfire Suppression Act.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/07/1989Became Public Law No: 101-11.
04/07/1989Signed by President.
03/28/1989Presented to President.
03/17/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
03/14/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/14/1989Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 101-5, Part I.
02/02/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
04/07/1989Became Public Law No: 101-11.
04/07/1989Signed by President.
03/28/1989HousePresented to President.
03/27/1989SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
03/20/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/17/1989SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
03/15/1989SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30. By unanimous consent.
03/14/1989-12:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/1989-12:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/14/1989-12:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/14/1989HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
03/14/1989-12:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
03/14/1989-12:41pmHouseMr. de la Garza moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/14/1989HouseReported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 101-5, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/08/1989HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/08/1989HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/07/1989HouseFavorable Excutive Comment Received from USDA.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/01/1989HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy
03/01/1989HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy
03/01/1989HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy
02/09/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
02/06/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/06/1989HouseExecutive Comment Requested from USDA.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/02/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
02/02/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/02/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
02/02/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/02/1989 Referred to
03/08/1989 Markup by
03/14/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-5 Part 1
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy02/06/1989 Referred to
03/01/1989 Hearings by
03/01/1989 Markup by
03/01/1989 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs02/02/1989 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/02/1989 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands02/09/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.829.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.829. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/1989)

Wildfire Suppression Assistance Act - Amends the Temporary Emergency Wildfire Suppression Act to repeal the provision terminating the authority of the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to enter into agreements with foreign fire organizations for wildfire protection, to furnish or accept emergency wildfire protection resources from foreign fire organizations, or to incur obligations for reimbursement to Canada or Canadian organizations in furnishing U.S. wildfire protection resources. (Current law terminates such authority December 31, 1988.)