Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/06/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 03/22/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/22/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/22/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 03/22/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/22/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/22/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/22/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/22/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/22/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/22/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/22/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/22/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 03/22/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/22/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/22/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/22/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/22/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/22/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/22/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/22/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/22/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/22/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/22/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/22/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/22/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/22/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/22/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/22/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/22/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/22/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/22/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/22/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/22/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/22/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 03/22/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/22/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/22/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/22/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/06/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/25/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/03/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/24/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/10/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/21/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/25/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 02/07/1990
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/21/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/21/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/21/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 02/21/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/26/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/26/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/07/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/07/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/21/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/21/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/28/1990
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/15/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/24/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/11/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 06/21/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/28/1990
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/28/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/18/1990
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/18/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/18/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/20/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 08/03/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/13/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/13/1990