There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Puyallup Tribe of Indians Settlement Act of 1989

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Puyallup Tribe of Indians Settlement Act of 1989

Short Titles as Reported to House

Puyallup Tribe of Indians Settlement Act of 1989

Short Titles as Introduced

Puyallup Tribe of Indians Settlement Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the settlement of land claims of the Puyallup Tribe of Indians in the State of Washington, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/21/1989Became Public Law No: 101-41.
06/21/1989Signed by President.
06/09/1989Presented to President.
05/31/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
05/23/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
05/18/1989Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-57.
02/09/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
06/21/1989Became Public Law No: 101-41.
06/21/1989Signed by President.
06/09/1989HousePresented to President.
06/08/1989SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/01/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/31/1989SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
05/23/1989-1:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/1989-1:10pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
05/23/1989-1:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
05/23/1989-12:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
05/23/1989HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
05/23/1989-12:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
05/23/1989-12:44pmHouseMr. Miller (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/18/1989HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 34.
05/18/1989HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-57.
05/16/1989HouseExecutive Comment Received from Justice.
05/10/1989HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/10/1989HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
03/20/1989HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior, Justice.
02/23/1989HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
02/09/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
02/09/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/09/1989 Referred to
02/23/1989 Hearings by
05/10/1989 Markup by
05/18/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-57

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.932. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/23/1989)

Puyallup Tribe of Indians Settlement Act of 1989 - Declares that it is the purpose of this Act to ratify a certain agreement between the Puyallup Tribe and non-Indian settlement parties.

States that the Tribe and the United States as trustee for the Tribe relinquish claims to certain lands in the State of Washington in accordance with such agreement.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to accept the conveyance of certain lands and to hold such lands in trust for the benefit of the Tribe. Absolves the Tribe from liability for cleanup costs for contamination of such lands, except contamination caused by the Tribe after conveyance of such lands.

Authorizes appropriations for the Federal share for the purchase of certain lands.

Requires the Secretary to place a certain amount in an annuity fund or other investment program for purposes of making individual one-time payments to members of the Tribe. Establishes the Puyallup Tribe of Indians Settlement Trust Fund. Sets forth the purposes for which the Fund may be used. Authorizes appropriations for the Federal share of the annuity and trust funds.

Authorizes appropriations for navigation equipment at Commencement Bay.

Directs the Secretary to disburse a certain amount to the Tribe for economic development and assistance to Indian business enterprises.

Recognizes the Tribe's right to engage in foreign trade.

Authorizes appropriations for the Federal share of costs of the Blair Project. Directs the Secretary to transfer such amount to the Washington State Department of Transportation to carry out the project. Provides that operation and maintenance of the Blair Waterway channel shall remain the Secretary of the Army's responsibility.