Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/02/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/02/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/02/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/02/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/02/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/02/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 05/02/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/02/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/02/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/02/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 05/02/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/02/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/02/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/02/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/02/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/02/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/02/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/02/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/02/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/02/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/02/1989
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/02/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 05/02/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/02/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/02/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/02/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/02/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/16/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/16/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/16/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/16/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/16/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/16/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/16/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/16/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/16/1989
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/16/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/16/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 06/12/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/12/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/12/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/12/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/12/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/24/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/24/1989
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 07/24/1989
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 07/24/1989
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/24/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/24/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/24/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/24/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/24/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/24/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 09/06/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/06/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/06/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/06/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/06/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/06/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/06/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 09/06/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/06/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/06/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/06/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 09/06/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/06/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 09/06/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/06/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 09/06/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/06/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/06/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/11/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 10/11/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/11/1989
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/27/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 09/27/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/27/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 09/27/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 09/27/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/27/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 09/27/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/27/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/27/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 09/27/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/27/1990