Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/23/1989
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 02/23/1989
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 02/23/1989
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 02/23/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/23/1989
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 02/23/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/23/1989
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/23/1989
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/23/1989
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 02/23/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/23/1989
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 02/23/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 02/23/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 02/23/1989
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 02/23/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/23/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 02/23/1989
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 02/23/1989
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 02/23/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 02/23/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/23/1989
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/23/1989
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 02/23/1989
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 02/23/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/23/1989
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 02/23/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 02/23/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/23/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 02/23/1989
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 02/23/1989
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/23/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 02/23/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 02/23/1989
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/01/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/01/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/01/1989
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 03/01/1989
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 03/01/1989
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 03/01/1989
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/01/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 03/01/1989
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 03/01/1989
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 03/21/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/21/1989
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 05/03/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 06/14/1989