Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/09/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/20/1989
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/20/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/12/1989
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/12/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/12/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/12/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/12/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/12/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/12/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/12/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/12/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/12/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/12/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/12/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/12/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/04/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/04/1989
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 05/04/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/04/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/24/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/24/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/24/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/24/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/24/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/24/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 05/24/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/29/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/29/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 08/04/1989