Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/02/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/02/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/02/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 03/02/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 03/02/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/02/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/02/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/02/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 03/02/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/02/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/02/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/02/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/03/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/03/1989
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/03/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/03/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/03/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/03/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/03/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/03/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/22/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/22/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/22/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/22/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 05/22/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/22/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/22/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/20/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/20/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 06/20/1989