Committees: H.R.987 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs02/09/1989 Referred to
05/31/1989 Markup by
06/13/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-84 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Water, Power and Offshore Energy Resources03/14/1989 Referred to
03/14/1989 Hearings by
05/24/1989 Discharged from
House Agriculture06/13/1989 Referred to
06/21/1989 Markup by
06/29/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-84 Part 2
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy06/14/1989 Referred to
06/21/1989 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/17/1989 Referred to
03/07/1990 Markup by
03/30/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-261
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests07/18/1989 Referred to
02/26/1990 Hearings by