There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Handgun Violence Prevention Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit certain handguns which are unsuitable for lawful sporting purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/09/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/26/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
04/06/1989Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
04/05/1989Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
03/27/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/09/1989Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/09/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/09/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/28/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 02/28/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 02/28/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/18/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/18/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/02/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/02/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 05/16/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/16/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/31/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/31/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/31/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/31/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/14/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/21/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/21/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/28/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/28/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/06/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 10/18/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 10/18/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 10/24/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/24/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 03/13/1990
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/01/1990
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/16/1989 05/24/1989 --
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/16/1989 05/24/1989 --
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 05/16/1989 05/24/1989 --
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 05/16/1989 05/24/1989 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/09/1989 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime03/27/1989 Referred to
04/26/1990 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.993.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.993. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/09/1989)

Handgun Violence Prevention Act of 1989 - Amends the Federal criminal code to make it unlawful for any person to manufacture, assemble, transfer, or possess any handgun which the Secretary of the Treasury determines to be unsuitable for lawful sporting purposes.