Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 06/13/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 06/13/1989
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 06/13/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 06/13/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/13/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 08/04/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 08/04/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 08/04/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 08/04/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 08/04/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 08/04/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/04/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/04/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/04/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 08/04/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 08/04/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 08/04/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/04/1989
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 08/04/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 08/04/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 08/04/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/19/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/19/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/19/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/19/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 11/17/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/21/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 02/21/1990
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 02/21/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/02/1990
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 08/03/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/05/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 09/05/1990
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/05/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/24/1990
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 09/24/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/24/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/24/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 09/24/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/24/1990
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 10/05/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/05/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/05/1990
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 10/05/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/05/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/05/1990
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/19/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/22/1990