Committees: H.Con.Res.172 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/20/1989 Referred to
09/18/1990 Markup by
09/21/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-737
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations08/14/1989 Referred to
05/15/1990 Hearings by
08/02/1990 Markup by
08/02/1990 Reported by
Senate Judiciary10/01/1990 Referred to
10/09/1990 Discharged from