Text: H.Con.Res.221 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House

 
 
HCON 221 IH
101st CONGRESS
1st Session
H. CON. RES. 221
Reaffirming United States support for peace and democracy in Central America.
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
November 2, 1989
Mr. CROCKETT (for himself, Mr. LAGOMARSINO, Mr. FASCELL, Mr. BROOMFIELD,
Mr. HAMILTON, Mr. YATRON, Mr. SOLARZ, Mr. WOLPE, Mr. GEJDENSON, Mr. DYMALLY,
Mr. LANTOS, Mr. KOSTMAYER, Mr. TORRICELLI, Mr. SMITH of Florida, Mr. BERMAN,
Mr. FUSTER, Mr. OWENS of Utah, Mr. ENGEL, Mr. FALEOMAVAEGA, Mr. PAYNE of
New Jersey, Mr. GILMAN, Mr. HOUGHTON, and Mr. GOSS) submitted the following
concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs
CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
Reaffirming United States support for peace and democracy in Central America.
Whereas the governments of the countries of Central America have entered
into a series of accords to promote peace and democracy in the region,
most recently the Tela Accord of August 7, 1989;
Whereas in those accords the Government of Nicaragua has made commitments to
promote democracy and pluralism, foster the process of national reconciliation,
and respect human, civil, social, economic, religious, and cultural rights;
Whereas on February 14, 1989, in Costa del Sol, El Salvador, President Ortega
committed the Government of Nicaragua to hold free and fair elections no
later than February 25, 1990;
Whereas the electoral process in Nicaragua is well underway with candidate
selection and voter registration completed;
Whereas the Bipartisan Accord on Central America of March 24, 1989, led to
strong expression of bipartisan support for United States policy in Central
America and specifically encourages the Government of Nicaragua and the
Nicaraguan Resistance to continue the cessation of hostilities currently
in effect;
Whereas there have been incidents in which forces of the Government of
Nicaragua and of the Nicaraguan Resistance have violated the cease-fire,
but such incidents do not justify the termination of the ceasefire; and
Whereas on November 1, 1989, President Ortega announced his decision to
end the cease-fire between the Government of Nicaragua and the Nicaraguan
Resistance that has been in place for the last 19 months, and to commence
offensive military operations: Now, therefore, be it
  Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That
  the Congress--
  (1) reaffirms its support for the goals of democracy, peace, freedom,
  and security in Central America and the terms of the Bipartisan Accord on
  March 24, 1989;
  (2) strongly supports the progress that has been made toward holding free
  and fair elections in Nicaragua on February 25, 1989;
  (3) condemns the action by President Ortega to end the cease-fire with
  the Nicaraguan Resistance and to begin offensive military operations,
  calls on him to reverse that decision, and calls on both the Government
  of Nicaragua and the Nicaraguan Resistance to abide by the cease-fire; and
  (4) would deplore any effort by the Government of Nicaragua to curtail,
  postpone, or cancel free and fair elections on February 25, 1990, or to
  use any pretense to impose emergency laws during the period leading up
  to the election, and would equally deplore any action by the Nicaraguan
  Resistance intended to disrupt those elections.