Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 01/31/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 01/31/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 01/31/1989
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 01/31/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 01/31/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 01/31/1989
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/31/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 01/31/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 01/31/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/31/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/31/1989
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 01/31/1989
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 01/31/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 01/31/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 01/31/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 01/31/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/31/1989
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/31/1989
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 01/31/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/31/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 01/31/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 01/31/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 01/31/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 01/31/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 01/31/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 01/31/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 01/31/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/31/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 01/31/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 01/31/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 01/31/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/31/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 02/07/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/07/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/07/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 02/07/1989
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/07/1989
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/07/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/07/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 02/07/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/07/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/07/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 02/28/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/28/1989
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 02/28/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 02/28/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 02/28/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/28/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/23/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 03/23/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/23/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 11/21/1989

Show cosponsors who withdrew