Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/23/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/23/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/23/1990
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/23/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/05/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/05/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/05/1990
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/05/1990
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 06/05/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/05/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/05/1990
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 06/05/1990
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/05/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/05/1990
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/05/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 06/05/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/05/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 06/05/1990
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 06/05/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/05/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/05/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/05/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/05/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/07/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/07/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/07/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/07/1990
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 06/07/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/07/1990
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/07/1990
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/07/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/07/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/07/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/12/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/12/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 06/12/1990
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/12/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/12/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 06/18/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/18/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/18/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/18/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/18/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/18/1990
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/18/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/18/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/18/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/18/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 06/18/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/18/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/18/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 06/18/1990
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/18/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/18/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/18/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/18/1990
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/18/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/18/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/18/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/18/1990
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/18/1990
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/18/1990
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 06/18/1990
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/18/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/18/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 06/18/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/1990
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/19/1990
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 06/19/1990
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/19/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/19/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 06/19/1990
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 06/19/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/19/1990
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 06/19/1990
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/20/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/20/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/20/1990
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/20/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/20/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/20/1990