Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 01/27/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/27/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 02/02/1989
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 02/07/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/22/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/22/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 02/22/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/07/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 03/21/1989