Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/24/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 09/24/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/24/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/26/1990
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/26/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/01/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/01/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/02/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/02/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/02/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/06/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/06/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/06/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/15/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/15/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/15/1990