Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 10/10/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/13/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/13/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 10/16/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/16/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 10/16/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/17/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 10/17/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/22/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/22/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/22/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/22/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/22/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/22/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/22/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 10/22/1990
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 10/22/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/22/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/22/1990
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 10/22/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 10/22/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 10/22/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 10/22/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/22/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/22/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 10/22/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 10/22/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/22/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/22/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/22/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 10/22/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 10/22/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 10/22/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/22/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/22/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 10/22/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 10/22/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/22/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/22/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/22/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 10/22/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/22/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/22/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/22/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/22/1990