There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Commemorating the bicentennial of Bastille Day.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/02/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/15/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
02/14/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/02/1989Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/1989Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (120)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 03/21/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 03/21/1989
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/21/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 03/21/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/17/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/17/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/17/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/17/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 05/17/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/17/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 05/17/1989
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/17/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 05/17/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/17/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/17/1989
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/17/1989
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 05/17/1989
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 05/17/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 05/17/1989
Rep. Smith, Larkin [R-MS-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 05/17/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/17/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/17/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/17/1989
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 05/17/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 05/17/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/17/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 05/17/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/17/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 05/17/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/17/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/17/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 05/17/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 05/17/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 05/17/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/17/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/17/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/17/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/17/1989
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/17/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/17/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/17/1989
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/17/1989
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/17/1989
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/17/1989
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/17/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/17/1989
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/17/1989
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 05/17/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/17/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 05/17/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/17/1989
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/17/1989
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/17/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 05/17/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/17/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/17/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 05/17/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/17/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 05/17/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 05/17/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/17/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service02/02/1989 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population02/15/1989 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/02/1989 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East02/14/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.43.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.43. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/1989)

Extends regards to the people of France on the occasion of the bicentennial of Bastille Day.

Urges the people of the United States to observe the bicentennial on July 14, 1989.

Finds that France and the United States remain committed to the principles of the Declaration of the Rights of Man and of the Citizen and the Bill of Rights.