Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/07/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/09/1989
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/09/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/06/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/06/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/14/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/05/1989
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 04/13/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/03/1989
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/03/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 05/10/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 05/10/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 07/11/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/21/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 01/24/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/26/1990